Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mattox, Marie A, filed a(n) Other case against Kevin Crews In His Official Ca, Washington County Florida, represented by Evans, Robert Wayne Gordon, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with Christopher N. Patterson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher N. Patterson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2018 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Marie A. Mattox, P.A. against Kevin Crews, in his official capacity as the Sheriff of Washington County, Florida, and Washington County, Florida. The purpose of this action is to enforce Chapter 119, Florida Statutes (Flori...
COMPLAINT
Date: November 12, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 12, 2018ANSWER/COUNTER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: PATTERSON , CHRISTOPHER N Assigned | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Event LACK OF PROSECUTION scheduled on 1/28/2022 at 0900 AM, CH - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. | |
November 20, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL | |
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER/COUNTER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Defendant Attorney: Robert W Evans Assigned to KEVIN CREWS IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SHERIFF | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE REVANS@ANBLAW | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSIVE PLEADING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.