Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Moton, Lewis M. Jr, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Nwfrc, Warden Maddox, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
ORDER DIRECTION PETITIONER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | 1D19-3431 MANDATE AND OPINION | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | OPINION - AFFIRMED | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER 1D19-3431 | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER - DISMISSED 1D19-3431 | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER - MOTION TO STRIKE GRANTED, INITIAL BRIEF STRICKEN, RECORD DUE | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | DCA ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF NEW CASE 1D19-3431 | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER - DISMISSED AS MOOT | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND ORDER ACCEPTING DEPARTMENTS RESPONSE AS TIMELY FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.