Case Last Refreshed: 22 hours ago
Sumpter, James, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Gordon, Alfred Benjamin, against Davis, Chris, Mangrove Estate & Garden Llc, Mangrove Estates, Llc, Mangroves Management, Llc, Roberson, Brandon, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Walton County, FL, . Walton County, FL Superior Courts with GREEN, DAVID WALKER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2024 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWalton County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
RETURN OF SERVICE TO MANGROVE ESTATE & GARDEN ON 04/22/2024
Date: April 25, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE TO MANGROVES MANAGEMENT ON 04/22/2024
Date: April 25, 2024WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: April 22, 2024UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO IRIS ROBERSON
Date: April 08, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED TO: BRANDON ROBERSON
Date: April 08, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MANGROVE ESTATES, LLC
Date: April 08, 2024UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO MANGROVE ESTATES, LLC
Date: April 08, 2024UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO MANGROVE ESTATE & GARDEN, LLC
Date: April 08, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MANGROVE ESTATE & GARDEN LLC
Date: April 08, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CHRIS DAVIS
Date: April 08, 2024UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BRANDON ROBERSON
Date: April 08, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET;
Date: April 08, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED TO: IRIS ROBERSON
Date: April 08, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: April 08, 2024UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO MANGROVE MANAGEMENT, LLC
Date: April 08, 2024UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO CHRIS DAVIS
Date: April 08, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MANGROVES MANAGMENT, LLC
Date: April 08, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE TO CHRIS DAVIS ON 04/23/2024
Date: April 24, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE TO MANGROVE ESTATE & GARDEN ON 04/22/2024 | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE TO MANGROVES MANAGEMENT ON 04/22/2024 | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE TO CHRIS DAVIS ON 04/23/2024 | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO IRIS ROBERSON | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO: BRANDON ROBERSON | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MANGROVE ESTATES, LLC | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO MANGROVE ESTATES, LLC | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO MANGROVE ESTATE & GARDEN, LLC | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MANGROVE ESTATE & GARDEN LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.