Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Tollett, Ashlee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Tollett, John Iv, in the jurisdiction of Walton County, FL, . Walton County, FL Superior Courts with LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 46-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWalton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | EVIDENCE DATA SHEET | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF TEMPORARY JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | EVIDENCE DATA SHEET | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND TEMPORARY INJUNCTION | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE TO JOHN TOLLETT, IV 10/4/23 | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITH MINOR CHILD(REN) | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE TO WILLIAM C WELLS 9/22/23 | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ZOOM APPEARANCE | |
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE TO JOHN TOLLETT, IV ON 9/12/2023 | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF NONSERVICE ON JOHN TOLLETT IV |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.