Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Murphy, Jackson, Murphy, Kristin, Ruffier, Marguerite, The Estate Of Carole Tanklage, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Swett, Thomas M, against Blim, Marianne, Ellison, Tom, Meyer, Doreen, Volcano Hills Road Maintenance Association, White, Bob, (total of 5) See All represented by Burke, Nicholas P, In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJune 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2099 | Docket Event | CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH: 20-SC-3856. THIS IS THE LEAD CASE. | |
June 28, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Parties, and counsel if represented, are ordered to appear personally or remotely for settlement conference. You must notify the court and all other parties that you intend to appear remotely using fo... | |
September 14, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Parties, or counsel if represented, are ordered to appear personally or remotely to discuss the status of the case and to set trial dates. You must notify the court and all other parties that you inte... | |
June 15, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | No appearances necessary. After review of the file, the matter is continued for further case management to September 14, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. in Department 3. Updated CMC Statements must be filed and ser... | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ** BY FAX ** CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT UNLIMITED CASE HEARING DATE OF 11/03/21 |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL TO NICHOLAS P. BURKE, ESQ.; ANGELA C. ALLARD, ESQ. ON 10/13/21 OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. THOMAS M SWETT (Attorney) on behalf of MARGUERITE RUFFIER, JACKSON MURPHY, KRISTIN MURPHY, THE ESTATE OF CAROLE TANKLAGE (PLAINTIFF) | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. 11-3-2021. KRISTIN MURPHY (PLAINTIFF); ; THOMAS M SWETT (Attorney) on behalf of MARGUERITE RUFFIER, JACKSON MURPHY, THE ESTATE OF CAROLE TANKLAGE (PLAINTIFF) | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | FIRST PAPER PLEADING (BY DEFENDANT) MARIANNE BLIM Receipt: 267962 Date: 07/19/2021 FILED BY ATTORNEY NICHOLAS P BURKE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT MARIANNE BLUM. | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | FIRST PAPER PLEADING (BY DEFENDANT) DOREEN MEYERS Receipt: 267962 Date: 07/19/2021 FILED BY ATTORNEY NICHOLAS P BURKE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT DOREEN MEYERS | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | FIRST PAPER PLEADING (BY DEFENDANT) TOM ELLISON. Receipt: 267962 Date: 07/19/2021 FILED BY ATTORNEY NICHOLAS P BURKE ON BEHALF TOM ELLISON. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.