Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vaneycken, Christopher, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Oakey, Wyatt Mattison, against Brodrick, Matthew Michael, represented by Cozart, Stephen Marshall, in the jurisdiction of Walton County, FL, . Walton County, FL Superior Courts with David W. Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 25, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWalton County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
COMPLAINT
Date: October 25, 2019ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENESE OF THE DEFENDANT, MATTHEW MICHAEL BRODRICK
Date: May 13, 2020PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION'S NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CHRISTOPHER VANECKEN | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MATTHEW MICHAEL BRODRICK'S SECOND REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFENDANT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENAS | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MATTHEW MICHAEL BRODRICK'S REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFENDANT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE ON NON-OBJECTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.