Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Westfield Group Insurance Comp, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Marcadis, Ralph Sam, against Allen, Cody Louis, in the jurisdiction of Walton County, FL, . Walton County, FL Superior Courts with GREEN, DAVID WALKER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWalton County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
COMPLAINT
Date: November 30, 2018NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: November 30, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CODY LOUIS ALLEN
Date: December 06, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO CODY L ALLEN ON 12/10/18
Date: December 11, 2018NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: March 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO CODY L ALLEN ON 12/10/18 | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CODY LOUIS ALLEN | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED: $410.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 110774 | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $410.00 | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET; | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED SUMMONS CODY LOUIS ALLEN | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.