Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Day, Curt, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Day, Rebecca, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with SMITH, J LAYNE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION 02/22/2024 09:30 AM ZOOM | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF WIFE'S STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERROGATORIES TO HUSBAND | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT/HUSBAND | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Event MEDIATION scheduled on 12/5/2023 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge MEDIATOR MEDIATOR presiding. | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION - 12/5/23 9:30AM ZOOM | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT/WIFE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.