Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Deas, Jeffrey Lamar, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Nahoom, Kendall Mcvay, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with J SMITH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (EXPIRES 12/6/2023) | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 5/24/2023 | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED COPIES | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: SMITH , J LAYNE assigned | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 652023DR000200DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/23/2023 | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S IDENTIFICATION | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | PETI FOR INJUNCT FOR PROTECT AGNST DOMESTIC VIOLEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.