Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Crochet, Dustin Lane, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Thomas, Kenneth Levi Jr, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with SMITH, J LAYNE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Order FJ OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY OR DEPENDENT MINOR CHILDREN | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE CASES | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (NOT NOTARIZED) | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | EMAILED CM TO REVIEW | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 6/13/2023 | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED pltf took to LCSO for service | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00 | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.