Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gray, Jonathan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gray, Terrye, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with SMITH, J LAYNE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order FINAL JUDGMENT | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE CASES | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: for to Jonathan Gray | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 10205 | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | STANDING FAMILY LAW PRETRIAL COURT ORDER emailed to atty | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: SMITH , J LAYNE Assigned | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 652023DR000192DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/16/2023 | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF COURSE COMPLETION BOTH PARTIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.