Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dept Of Revenue, Mogle, Pepper L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mogle, Chloe L, Spencer, Chloe, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with SMITH, JACQUELINE H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 09, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO REDIRECT PAYMENTS TO NEW TITLE IV-D CASE (CHILD SUPPORT THROUGH DEPT OF REVENUE) | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Order RECOMMENDED ON FINAL JUDGEMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT AUDIT | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: SMITH , JACQUELINE H Assigned | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 8/25/2023 at 0845 AM, MX - Judge JACQUELINE SMITH presiding. | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT - | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 8/25/23 8:45AM IN PERSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.