Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dickens, Merilee Amelia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dickens, Matthew Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with FOSTER, DINA P presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 09, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | TRANSFER LETTER | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | TRANSFER LETTER SENT TO LEON COUNTY | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Order UPON RECOMMENDED ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE TO LEON COUNTY PENDING FILE 2023 DR 1285 | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 8/7/2023 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge DINA FOSTER presiding. | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE 8/7/23 10:00AM ZOOM | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: FOSTER , DINA P Assigned | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 5/11/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.