Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jones, Guy M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wisham, Amanda Jean, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with FOSTER, DINA P presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Respondent Attorney: for to AMANDA JEAN WISHAM | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL OF RECORD | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD (CONSENTED) | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: FOSTER , DINA P Assigned | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDED REPORT OF MAGISTRATE | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF TO ESTABLISH PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY, TEMPORARY TIME-SHARING, & TO COMPEL MOTHER TO ALLOW MINOR CHILD TO ATTEND THERAPY WITH FATHER | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER JOINT STIPULATION ON PATERNITY | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Order REQUIRING MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.