Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Department Of Revenue, Groover, Moesha Nora, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Grandberry, Jerrod A, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with SMITH, JACQUELINE H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 25, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Order RECOMMENDED ON FINAL JUDGEMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF PURGE PAYMENT | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Process Release Updated: $1,000.00 | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Active Process WRIT OF ATTACHMENT disposition on 9/6/2023 | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Active Process WRIT OF ATTACHMENT | |
August 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF HEARING OFFICER AND ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTEMPT | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF HEARING OFFICER AND ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTEMPT | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT AUDIT | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 8/25/2023 at 0845 AM, MX - Judge JACQUELINE SMITH presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.