Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Albanese, Christina, The Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Timmons, Tyrone O, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with SMITH, JACQUELINE H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PETITION TO ESTABLISH SUPPORT | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED - UNABLE TO LOCATE TYRONE TIMMONS | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: SMITH , JACQUELINE H Assigned | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: for to CHRISTINA ALBANESE | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: for to TYRONE O TIMMONS | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 652023DR000130DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2023 | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES AND NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.