Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Estes Investment Properties Ll, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Power, Andrew Joseph, against Tyree, Carolyn Ann, Tyree, Murl, represented by Power, Andrew Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with SMITH, J LAYNE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 24, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED MURL TYREE 6/7/23
Date: June 07, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED MURL TYREE
Date: May 24, 2023PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: July 13, 2023NOTICE OF ACTION (clerk emailed NOA to newspaper on 6/9/23)
Date: June 08, 2023Order FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: May 25, 2023LIS PENDENS
Date: May 24, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA
Date: May 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT FOR CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE MURL TYREE AND CAROLYN ANN TYREE
Date: June 08, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED CAROLYN ANN TYREE
Date: May 24, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED CAROLYN ANN TYREE 6/7/23
Date: June 07, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT- MURL TYREE & CAROLYN ANN TYREE
Date: July 17, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: July 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT- MURL TYREE & CAROLYN ANN TYREE | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION (clerk emailed NOA to newspaper on 6/9/23) | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FOR CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE MURL TYREE AND CAROLYN ANN TYREE | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED MURL TYREE 6/7/23 | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 6/7/2023 | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED CAROLYN ANN TYREE 6/7/23 | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: for to ESTES INVESTMENT PROPERTIES LLC | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: for to MURL TYREE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.