Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Cardinal Financial Company Lim, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by York, Julie, against Morgan, Ashley M, Morgan, Justin L, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with SMITH, J LAYNE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 04, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA
Date: May 04, 2023LIS PENDENS
Date: May 04, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED JUSTIN MORGAN
Date: May 04, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED ASHLEY MORGAN
Date: May 04, 2023NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION (PLAINTIFF)
Date: May 04, 2023Order FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: May 08, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNIFORM ORDER
Date: May 11, 2023FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: June 14, 2023Return of Service Served ASHLEY MORGAN 5/16/23
Date: May 30, 2023Return of Service Served JUSTIN MORGAN 5/16/23
Date: May 30, 2023NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (clerk needs $18.50 recording fee)
Date: June 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (clerk needs $18.50 recording fee) | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of Service Served ASHLEY MORGAN 5/16/23 | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of Service Served JUSTIN MORGAN 5/16/23 | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 5/16/2023 | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNIFORM ORDER | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Order FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: for to Cardinal Financial Company Limited Partnership | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $1,930.00 Receipt Number MX 10120 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.