Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Estes Investment Properties Ll, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Power, Andrew Joseph, against Willis, Perry E, represented by Power, Andrew Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with SMITH, J LAYNE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
|
VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA
Date: May 04, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 04, 2023LIS PENDENS
Date: May 04, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED PERRY E. WILLIS
Date: May 04, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT - AND DEFAULT- PERRY E. WILLIS
Date: June 30, 2023Order FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGMENT
Date: May 08, 2023NOTICE OF ACTION EMAILED TO ATTY AND NEWSPAPER
Date: May 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE PERRY E. WILLIS 5/12/23
Date: May 19, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT FOR CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE
Date: May 22, 2023PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: June 28, 2023DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: July 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT - AND DEFAULT- PERRY E. WILLIS | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF ACTION | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION EMAILED TO ATTY AND NEWSPAPER | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FOR CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE PERRY E. WILLIS 5/12/23 | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 5/12/2023 | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: for to ESTES INVESTMENT PROPERTIES LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.