Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Miller, Christopher, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Saalmann, Kelsey Elizabeth, against Cromartie, Jimmie, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with SMITH, J LAYNE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 21, 2023Order FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: May 18, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 21, 2023REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, JIMMIE CROMARITE
Date: May 16, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, JIMMIE CROMARITE
Date: May 16, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, JIMMIE CROMARITE
Date: May 16, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: May 16, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED JIMMIE CROMARITE
Date: May 16, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JIMMIE CROMARITE 6/6/23
Date: June 15, 2023RESPONSE FROM JIMMIE CROMARTIE
Date: June 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FLORIDA TRAFFIC CRASH REPORT FROM 11/8/22 (DEFENDANT- JIMMIE CROMARITE | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE FROM JIMMIE CROMARTIE | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JIMMIE CROMARITE 6/6/23 | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 6/6/2023 | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Order FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | SIGNED SUMMONS EMAILED TO FIRM (NON IMAGE) | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 10199 | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Attorney: Kelsey Elizabeth Saalmann for to CHRISTOPHER MILLER | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Active Process SUMMONS | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.