Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Taylor, Hannah, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Smith, Matthew Allen, against Scott, Julie Ann, Usaa Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 21, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 21, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL WITHIN THE SAME FIRM (PLAINTIFF)
Date: May 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Attorney: Matthew Allen Smith for to HANNAH TAYLOR | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL WITHIN THE SAME FIRM (PLAINTIFF) | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: for to HANNAH TAYLOR | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 9639 | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 652023CA000316CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/21/2023 | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.