Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Jenkins, Jessica, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Kaplin-Zhebrak, Michelle Fallyn, against Rentokil North America Inc, Sherman, Michael Cornelius, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with SMITH, J LAYNE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedJune 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
|
Order FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: April 05, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED RENTOKIL NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Date: April 04, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL SHERMAN
Date: April 04, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 21, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 21, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED RENTOKIL NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Date: April 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 9955 | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED RENTOKIL NORTH AMERICA, INC. | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $10.00 | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | SIGNED SUMMONS EMAILED TO FIRM (NON IMAGE) | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Active Process SUMMONS | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED RENTOKIL NORTH AMERICA, INC. | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL SHERMAN | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00 | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $20.00 Receipt Number MX 9910 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.