Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with J. Layne Smith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: March 21, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 21, 2023Order FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: April 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Order FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: SMITH , J LAYNE Assigned | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: for to PHILLIP NEELY | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 9456 | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 652023CA000132CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/21/2023 | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.