Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Gray, Ursula, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Marrese, Michael David, against Alsharif, Fadi, Insurance Company, Progressiv, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with SMITH, J LAYNE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedMay 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
|
Order FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: April 26, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 21, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: May 05, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 21, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: May 05, 2023REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 05, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: May 05, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED FADI ALSHARIF
Date: May 05, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE INS. COMP.
Date: May 05, 2023REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS. COMPANY
Date: May 15, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: May 15, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS, COMPANY
Date: May 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $10.00 | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 10185 | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS. COMPANY (PALINTIFF) | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS. COMPANY | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS. COMPANY | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS, COMPANY | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $20.00 Receipt Number MX 10133 | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00 | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.