Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Rakes, Patches Sue, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Collins, Robert Franklin Iv, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with BANKS, JAMES CAMERON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO REDIRECT PAYMENTS TO NEW TITLE IV-D CASE (CHILD SUPPORT THROUGH DEPT OF REVENUE) | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $12.00 | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $12.00 Receipt Number MX 2022007855 | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING MAGISTRATE'S REPORT FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 10/4/2022 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge JAMES BANKS presiding. | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 10/4/2022 2:00 PM ZOOM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.