Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Barker, Antoynette, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Barker, James, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with PEDROSO, ACELO ISIDRO presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 02, 2019 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Order ON MAGISTRATE'S ON FINAL JUDGMENT ON PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN INCORPORATION MSA AND PARENTING PLAN | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event | FLORIDA PARENTING CLASS CERTIFICATE | |
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: PEDROSO , ACELO Assigned | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 8/16/2019 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge ACELO PEDROSO presiding. | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 8/16/19 10AM | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER/RESPONDENT | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT/RESPONDENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.