Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rawls, Elizabeth Caroline, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rawls, Jacob Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with FLURY, RONALD WALLACE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2019 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE CASES | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order FINALJUDGMENT | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge: FLURY , RONALD W Assigned | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | MEDIATION AGREEMENT | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT/WIFE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.