Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Williams, Arthur L, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Dixon- Secretary- Fl. Dept. Of, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with CARROLL, KEVIN JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 02, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedJune 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF THE COURT TO SHOW CAUSE | |
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event | MANDATE PER CURIAM AFFIRMED | |
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event | SUP 1 RECORD ON APPEAL EFILED TO DCA AND AG PAPER COPY MAILED TO DEFENDANT AT WCI | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER TO THE CLERK FROM PETITIONER | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | DIRECTIONS TO CLERK | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF JUDICIAL ACTS TO BE REVIEWED | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | RECORD ON APPEAL EFILED TO DCA AND AG PAPER COPY MAILED TO DEFENDANT AT WCI | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF THE COURT | |
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF NEW CASE 1D19-1911 | |
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF THE COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.