Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Ameris Bank, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 37-D case represented by Anderson, William Lewis, against Doe, Jane, Doe, John, Gueltzow, Wayne Allen, Macafee, Chester, Macfee, Unkwn Spouse Of Cheste, (total of 7) See All represented by Strickland, Thomas Whitney, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with FLURY, RONALD WALLACE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 26, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: April 26, 2019MOTION TO APPOINT ATTY. AD LITEM (PLAINTIFF)
Date: April 26, 2019AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2019Order APPOINTING ATTY. AD LITEM- WHITNEY STRICKLAND
Date: June 19, 2019LIS PENDENS
Date: April 26, 2019SUMMONS WAYNE GUELTZOW
Date: September 17, 2019ANSWER(S) TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: October 07, 2019SUMMONS MICHAEL GUELTZOW
Date: September 17, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING 7/16/20 @ 1:30P.M. (FLURY) (MOTION)
Date: June 11, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING 10/13/20 @ 2:30P.M. (FLURY) (MOTION)
Date: September 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE WCSO POSTED WRIT OF REPLEVIN 3/1/21 | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTE- CLERK FILES EMAIL FROM 1/26/2021 TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING EXECUTION OF WRIT. | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTE (NON IMAGE) PLAINTIFF HAS NOT SUBMITTED PAYMENT OF COVER SHEET FOR WCSO. WRIT CAN NOT BE SERVED WITHOUT PAYMENT OR CONTACT INFO. FOR PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF CAN CONTACT THE CIRCUIT CIVIL CLERK WITH QUESTIONS. WRIT IS READY FOR SERVICE. | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF REPLEVIN- ISSUED | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $85.00 Receipt Number MX 458 | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 assessed at sum $85.00 | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF REPLEVIN (CLERK TO REVIEW) | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE 12/18/20 | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number MX 2007225 | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | BID SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.