Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Us Bank Trust National Associa, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 37-D case represented by Noyes, Laura Elizabeth, against Daniel P High Jr Known Heir Of, Unknown Heirs Devisees Grantee, Unknown Spouse Of Daniel P Hig, Unknown Spouse Of Robert M Bra, Unknown Spouse Of Timothy E Br, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with FLURY, RONALD WALLACE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 09, 2019VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA
Date: April 09, 2019SUMMONS JOANNE SMITH PARRISH, TRUSTEE OF RUBY R. SMITH REVOCABLE TRUST DTD 1/25/93
Date: April 09, 2019SUMMONS UNKNWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT L. HIGH
Date: April 09, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2019SUMMONS UNKNWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM J. HIGH
Date: April 09, 2019SUMMONS UNKNWN SPOUSE OF DANIEL P. HIGH, JR.
Date: April 09, 2019NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: November 01, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIENT SEARCH FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION- MARCIA F. BRADY & UNKWN SPOUSE OF MARCIA F. BRADY | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION- UNKWN HIERS TO DANIEL P. HIGH | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY UKWN HEIRS OF DANIEL P. HIGH, SR. | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION (CLERK EMAILED NOA TO NEWSPAPER ON 7/19/19) | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY MARCIA F. BRADY & UNKWN SPOUSE OF MARCIA F. BRADY | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES UNKNOWN SPOUSE JULIANN CAMPBELL, UNKNOWN SPOUSE WILLIAM CAMPBELL, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TIMOTHY BRADY, UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1, 2 AND 3 | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JULIANN CAMPBELL dismissed 7/11/2019 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.