Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Us Bank National Association A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fishman, Barry Stuart, against Jenkins, Andrea S, Kindell, Kelly B, Magnolia Ridge North Homeowner, United States Of America Actin, Unknown Parties In Possession, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with SHELFER, JAMES OLIVER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHELFER, JAMES OLIVER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (NEED $18.50 RECORDING FEE) | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT - ANDREA KINDELL, KELLY KINDELL, MAGNOLIA RIDGE NORTH HOA | |
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES UNKWN PARTIES 1 | |
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE (KELLY B. KINDELL & ANDREA S. KINDELL) | |
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER(S) TO COMPLAINT (USA) | |
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Return of Service Served ANDREA KINDELL 8/15/16 (SUB) | |
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2 8/15/16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.