Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sara Collins, against John H Oviatt, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2023 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Rp & Foreclosure < $50K |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypePending |
To Unknown Tenant in Possession 2
Date: July 18, 2023Unk tenant in poss 2
Date: September 12, 2023of John Lara Esq obo John Oviatt
Date: October 10, 2023To ACA Realty & Consulting Corp
Date: July 18, 2023To Zilla Stoute etc
Date: July 18, 2023To Unknown Tenant in Possession 1
Date: July 18, 2023To Zilla Stoute
Date: July 18, 2023Gulf Harbour Investments Corp of Note Possession
Date: July 18, 2023John H Oviatt aka John Oviatt as Co-Trustee of the 1761 West Acadian Drive Land Trust dated 01/05/17
Date: September 12, 2023Cert of Note Possession by Gulf Harbour Investments Corp
Date: July 18, 2023By Gulf Harbour Investments Corp
Date: July 18, 2023Unk tenant in poss 1 nka Mike
Date: September 12, 2023John Oviatt has 30 days to respond to Pltf's complaint
Date: October 16, 2023to respond to complaint by John Oviatt
Date: October 10, 2023complaint by John Oviatt
Date: November 15, 2023as to John H Oviatt and John Oviatt
Date: November 29, 2023Affidavit of Constructive Service
Date: October 23, 2023Real Property
Date: July 18, 2023as to Any and All Unknown Parties agst the 1761 West Acadian Drive Land Trust etc
Date: October 20, 2023as to John H Oviatt etc, Zilla Stoute etc and Unknown Tenant in Possession 1
Date: November 29, 2023as to Nicholas J Vanhook
Date: November 29, 2023By Sara Collins Esq
Date: July 18, 2023Zilla Stoute as Co-Trustee of the 1761 West Acadian Drive Land Trust dated 01/05/17
Date: September 12, 2023by Jon Lara Esq
Date: January 15, 2024Affirmative Defenses by Pltf
Date: January 17, 2024To John H Oviatt etc
Date: July 18, 2023Unknown Tenant In Possession 2 Instrument: 2023243817 Book: 8490 Page: 1453 View: 2023243817
Date: November 27, 2023dfnts mtn to dismiss; dfnt has until 1/12/2024 to file an answer
Date: December 04, 2023Instrument: 2023152332 Book: 8438 Page: 97 View: 2023152332
Date: July 18, 2023Zilla Stoute
Date: September 12, 2023ACA Realty and Consulting Corp
Date: September 12, 2023To John H Oviatt etc as Co-Trustee etc
Date: July 18, 2023Zilla Stoute etc and Unknown Tenant in Possession 1
Date: November 30, 2023John H Oviatt aka John Oviatt
Date: September 12, 2023To ZILLA STOUTE Frwd to Pltf's Atty & Proc Server (Max) via e-service for SOP
Date: July 25, 2023E-Filed
Date: July 18, 2023John H Oviatt w/affirm defenses
Date: January 12, 2024of Nicholas J Vanhook Esq obo pltf
Date: November 27, 2023by John Lara Esq
Date: October 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Affirmative Defenses by Pltf | |
January 15, 2024 | Docket Event | by Jon Lara Esq | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | John H Oviatt w/affirm defenses | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | dfnts mtn to dismiss; dfnt has until 1/12/2024 to file an answer | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Zilla Stoute etc and Unknown Tenant in Possession 1 | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | as to John H Oviatt and John Oviatt | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | as to John H Oviatt etc, Zilla Stoute etc and Unknown Tenant in Possession 1 | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | as to Nicholas J Vanhook | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Unknown Tenant In Possession 2 Instrument: 2023243817 Book: 8490 Page: 1453 View: 2023243817 | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | of Nicholas J Vanhook Esq obo pltf |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.