Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Cardinal Financial Company Limted Partnership, Freedom Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Heirs Devisees Grantees Assignees Lienors Creditors Trustees Of Catherine Theckla Velardi, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2023 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Rp & Forecl > $50K < $250K |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypePending |
To UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 1 rtn to pltf's atty via e-service for sop
Date: July 24, 2023by Cardinal Financial Company Limited Partnership
Date: July 18, 2023to Solar Mosaic Inc
Date: July 18, 2023Instrument: 2023151469 Book: 8437 Page: 2541 View: 2023151469
Date: July 18, 2023to Unknown Tenants Owners 1
Date: July 18, 2023To SOLAR MOSAIC INC rtn to pltf's atty via e-service for sop
Date: July 24, 2023To UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LUIGI VELARDI rtn to pltf's atty via e-service for sop
Date: July 24, 2023to Luigi Velardi
Date: July 18, 2023to Catherine Manigault
Date: July 18, 2023to Deltona Woods Community Association Inc
Date: July 18, 2023to Unknown Spouse of Catherine Manigault
Date: July 18, 2023to Unknown Spouse of Luigi Velardi
Date: July 18, 2023Solar Mosaic Inc
Date: September 19, 2023of order appt GAL by pltf
Date: February 13, 2024Brock & Scott PLLC obo Cardinal Financial Company etc
Date: February 19, 2024as to Luigi Velardi
Date: February 22, 2024of attd copy of Order Substituting Party Pltf by Freedom Mortgage Corp
Date: February 22, 2024to Freedom Mortgage Corp
Date: February 19, 2024of attd copy of Order Substituting Party Pltf by Freedom Mortgage Corp
Date: February 23, 2024Luigi Velardi as known heir of Catherine Theckla etc
Date: September 19, 2023Amanda Driscole in place of Kass Shuler obo pltf
Date: November 24, 2023Catherine Manigault etc
Date: October 06, 2023Unknown Heirs etc of Catherine Theckla Velardi etc
Date: October 31, 2023Unkn Heirs etc of Catherine Theckla Velardi etc
Date: November 14, 2023Unk tenants/owners 1
Date: October 06, 2023Unknown Spouse of Catherine Manigault etc
Date: October 16, 2023Unknown Tenants/Owners 1
Date: October 16, 2023Catherine Manigault etc
Date: October 16, 2023to perfect service by pltf
Date: November 14, 2023as to Unkn Heirs etc of Catherine Theckla Velardi etc
Date: October 19, 2023to Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Date: November 22, 2023Deltona Woods Community Assoc Inc
Date: September 19, 2023by Cardinal Financial Company
Date: January 04, 2024orig Note
Date: January 19, 2024of Kinley I Engvalson obo Catherine Manigault etc
Date: January 17, 2024efiled note
Date: January 18, 2024Amanda Driscole as co-counsel obo pltf
Date: September 25, 2023Catherine Manigault
Date: September 27, 2023Unk spouse of Luigi Velardi nka Michelle Velardi
Date: September 19, 2023to Unkn Heirs etc of Catherine Theckla Velardi etc; fwd to The Heritage News Journal for pub
Date: October 19, 2023to Freedom Mtg Corp
Date: November 29, 2023by Erica A Tracy obo pltf
Date: January 31, 2024by Shaib Rios Esq & costs & reasonable fees by Dinna M Toth Esq
Date: January 18, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | of attd copy of Order Substituting Party Pltf by Freedom Mortgage Corp | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | as to Luigi Velardi | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | of attd copy of Order Substituting Party Pltf by Freedom Mortgage Corp | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | of attd copy of Order Granting Mtn for Substitution of Counsel and Directing Clerk to Change Counsel by Freedom Mortgage Corp | |
February 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Brock & Scott PLLC obo Cardinal Financial Company etc | |
February 19, 2024 | Docket Event | to Freedom Mortgage Corp | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | of order appt GAL by pltf | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Julia Kite Powell Esq obo Unknown Heirs, Devisees etc | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | by Erica A Tracy obo pltf | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | orig Note |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.