Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Scott Day, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategorySummary Administration $1,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Disposed Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Intestate Instrument: 2021232659 Book: 8127 Page: 1731 View: 2021232659 | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Summary Testate | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | James Allen Stanley Jr., e-filed | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | from Knox County, TN (7 Pgs) | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Copies sent to Research companies per standing request | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | (intestate) Ancillary | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | James Stanley | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Ancillary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.