Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Thomas Siegle, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2021 |
CategorySummary Administration Under $1,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Disposed Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | by Capital One Bank for $3,265.93, e-svd. | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2021145326 Book: 8069 Page: 2729 View: 2021145326 | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Testate Instrument: 2021145333 Book: 8069 Page: 2747 View: 2021145333 | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | follow up review-Testate summary & homestead | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | by Bank of America for $2,182.47, e-svd. | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | dated 02/29/20, *8 pages (record) Instrument: 2021145325 Book: 8069 Page: 2721 View: 2021145325 | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Summary/Hmstd Eserved w/wksht(s) | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Summary Adm | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Det Hmstd | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | to Clerk re: submitting Original Self Proving Affadacit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.