Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Edward Nicholas, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 13, 2021 |
CategoryDisposition |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Disposed Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended - CC mailed Instrument: 2021157278 Book: 8077 Page: 4555 View: 2021157278 | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Dispositon | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Granted, *CC mailed* Instrument: 2021088257 Book: 8031 Page: 1194 View: 2021088257 | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposition | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | W/COPY OF FUNERAL BILL ATTACH | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Margaret I Nicholas | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Edward T Nicholas |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.