Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Anthony R Miller, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategorySummary Administration $1,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Disposed Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | by County of Volusia/EVAC for $641.00, e-svd. | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Intestate Instrument: 2021109828 Book: 8045 Page: 4208 View: 2021109828 | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Follow Up | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | of Marriage by Anthony Miller | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | by Keith Miller | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | by Michael P. Miller | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | by Kimberly Miller | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | by Brian D. Miller | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | to be addressed w/in 30 days | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Pro-Se Summary Admn.-Intestate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.