Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Eugene Bricker filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryProbate/Formal |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Kelly Gene Bricker Instrument: 2021193991 Book: 8101 Page: 2912 View: 2021193991 | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Dsc by Case Mgr. | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | of Inventory | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Acctg. & Cns to Distr. by Eugene Richard Bricker, II | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Inventory w/in 30 days *E-svd and mailed | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Kelly Gene Bricker, w/out bond Instrument: 2021093174 Book: 8034 Page: 2857 View: 2021093174 | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2021093183 Book: 8034 Page: 2867 View: 2021093183 | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | intestate formal | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Copies sent research co per standing request | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Intestate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.