Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2018 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | of completion of #97 by atty Mitchell G Wrenn obo resp | |
November 20, 2021 | Docket Event | of dockets 54.000, 63.000, 74.000 per AO-2010-215 | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | **joint** on resp mtn for attys fees | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ||
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | **joint** on resp mtn for attys fees | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | **limited** by atty Robert F Stepniak obo pet | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | see image | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ||
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | 4th, ntc of hrg by pet | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | by resp |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.