Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 03, 2022 |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | ||
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | by Carlee R Bruno Instrument: 2019122115 Book: 7710 Page: 3288 View: 2019122115 | |
June 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Detlev Schwartz | |
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event | (Expert) to Brooks L Davis by Carlee R Bruno | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Carlee Bruno & exhibit list | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | to EVAC, et al | |
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | w/Stan Strickland | |
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | of Brooks L Davis | |
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | of Carlee R Bruno | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.