Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2022 |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2019124128 Book: 7711 Page: 3704 View: 2019124128 | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | for discharge | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | ||
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Full Waiver Rcpt of Benf Cns to Dsc by Karen B. Taylor | |
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Ntc. to Creditors w/evidence of delivery | |
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | of Inventory | |
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | ||
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Ntc. to Creditors 1st pub 08/23/18 | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Est. Assets | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2018160050 Book: 7582 Page: 683 View: 2018160050 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.