Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2018 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2022 |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | for Dsc. | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2019188557 Book: 7751 Page: 2301 View: 2019188557 | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | ||
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Full Waiver Rcpt of Benf Cns to Dsc by Jean M. Zimmerman | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Full Waiver Rcpt of Benf Cns to Dsc by Marianne Maier | |
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | for Discharge until 09/01/19 | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | for Discharge | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | from Bank of America | |
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | by Marianne Maier |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.