Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fairwinds Credit Union, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case against John M Cotol, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts DeLand.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseDeLand |
Case Outcome TypeBefore Hearing - Other |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | w/o prej by Fairwinds Credit Union Instrument: 2019020056 Book: 7650 Page: 4905 View: 2019020056 | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | ||
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | John M Cotol aka John M Cisol | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | for Service of Process by Fairwinds Credit Union | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Fairwinds Credit Union to serve summons | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | by Fairwinds Credit Union - no order | |
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | To JOHN M COTOL A/K/A JOHN M CISOL fwd to pltfs atty via e-service for SOP | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | of Robert J Watson Jr |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.