Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2022 |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ||
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | w/prej by Glenda Durrence etc Instrument: 2019162380 Book: 7734 Page: 4713 View: 2019162380 | |
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Melissa Stanley | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | copies of all docs rcvd pursuant to ntc of production by State Farm | |
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event | of docs pursuant to notice of production from non party dtd 04-18-2019 by Glenda Durrence etc | |
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | to Aqua Clear Pools et al | |
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Nathan Bird | |
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Robert Edward Blanchard to pltfs req for copies dtd 1/7/19 | |
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | by Robert Edward Blanchard | |
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | of proposal for settlement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.