Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Charles Jordan, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Stacey Colbath, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts City Island Courthouse.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2017 |
CategoryFamily Law |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseCity Island Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Resp | |
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | as to RESP | |
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | 1copy/env Instrument: 2017142669 Book: 7425 Page: 4905 View: 2017142669 | |
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event | by petitioner | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | & proposed default as to Stacey Colbath | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | as to Stacey Colbath | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | as to Stacey Colbath 6/7/17 | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Return of Service by Charles Jordan | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | as to PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE To STACEY COLBATH e-served orig to atty for service | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | by pet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.