Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Amber Leigh Green, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Ashley Ann Dees, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts City Island Courthouse.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2017 |
CategoryFamily Law |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseCity Island Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulated Instrument: 2017199114 Book: 7459 Page: 2027 View: 2017199114 | |
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | as to resp | |
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | as to Ashley Ann Dees served 6/6/17 | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | as to PETITION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY To ASHLEY ANN DEES orig/copies mailed to petitioner | |
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | new suits checklist |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.