Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank N A, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts City Island Courthouse.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCity Island Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeBefore Hearing - Other |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | w/prej by Wells Fargo Bank NA Instrument: 2018246581 Book: 7632 Page: 3149 View: 2018246581 | |
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | by Wells Fargo | |
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Wells Fargo Bank of good cause and respose to Court's Notice of lack of prosecution | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | as to Jess W Kinmont | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | as to Jess W Kinmont w/prop default | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Karusha Y Sharpe obo Wells Fargo Bank NA | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulated Final Judgment and Order by Brian A McDowell, As Court Appointed Receiver | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | 60-Day Lack of Prosecution Notice to CHRISTOPHER GIACINTO III, attorney for WELLS FARGO BANK N A. | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | 60-Day Lack of Prosecution Notice to JESS W KINMONT. | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | 60-Day Lack of Prosecution Notice to ROLLING HILLS ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.