Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2015-6, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts City Island Courthouse.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCity Island Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2018043427 Book: 7514 Page: 2049 View: 2018043427 | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2018043422 Book: 7514 Page: 2042 View: 2018043422 | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Kahane & Associates P A | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Foreclosure Sale by Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2015-6, etc | |
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event | mtn to cancel forclosure sale | |
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event | by Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2015-6 US Bank National Association etc | |
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | sale and canceling 11/29/17 sale | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | by Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2015-6, US Bank National Association as Indenture Trustee sale of 11/29/17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.