Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateMay 31, 2017 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2022 |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2017119904 Book: 7412 Page: 2068 View: 2017119904 | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Resp, 6/8/17 | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | by pet | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | by pet (Per Judge will address at hrg set for 06/15/17) | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Resp 5/31/17 | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | to pet | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | pet | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.