Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateMay 30, 2017 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event | from The Centers as to Raven Gray | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | of conclusion of representation by atty Stepniak obo resp | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Resp 6/6/17 | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2017111123 Book: 7407 Page: 1023 View: 2017111123 | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | and e-mail address Robert Stepniak obo RESP | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | as to Raven L Gray served 5/30/17 | |
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event | to pet | |
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | pet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.